THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:40:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Limeridge Road East
Unit 7
Hamilton Ontario L8W 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-9474
Fax: (905) 574-7435
Address: Unit 800
723 Rymal Road
Hamilton Ontario L9B 2W1
Phone: (905) 574-9474
Fax: (905) 574-7435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Domenic Rosati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosati (CPSO#: 56867 )
Business Address: Unit 100
350 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Y3
(905) 527-2017
Business Address: Unit 7
1221 Limeridge Road East
Hamilton Ontario L8W 1Y1
(905) 574-9474
Business Address: Unit 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton Ontario L9B 2W2
(905) 385-9287

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Limeridge Road East
Unit 7
Hamilton Ontario L8W 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-9474
Fax: (905) 574-7435
Address: Unit 800
723 Rymal Road
Hamilton Ontario L9B 2W1
Phone: (905) 574-9474
Fax: (905) 574-7435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Domenic Rosati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosati (CPSO#: 56867 )
Business Address: Unit 100
350 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Y3
(905) 527-2017
Business Address: Unit 7
1221 Limeridge Road East
Hamilton Ontario L8W 1Y1
(905) 574-9474
Business Address: Unit 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton Ontario L9B 2W2
(905) 385-9287

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMENIC ROSATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSATI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMENIC ROSATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSATI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986