THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:11:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 679 Davis Dr
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-836-7100
Fax: 905-836-7062

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Douglas Watt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Watt (CPSO#: 56891 )
Business Address: 679 Davis Dr
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 679 Davis Dr
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-836-7100
Fax: 905-836-7062

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Douglas Watt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Watt (CPSO#: 56891 )
Business Address: 679 Davis Dr
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986