THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:52:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 473-4134
Fax: (613) 473-4740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Webb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Webb (CPSO#: 56892 )
Business Address: Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
(613) 473-4134

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 473-4134
Fax: (613) 473-4740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Webb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Webb (CPSO#: 56892 )
Business Address: Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
(613) 473-4134

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET LINDA WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET LINDA WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986