THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:27:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 215
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 764-5040
Fax: (905) 764-2977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Benzaquen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Benzaquen (CPSO#: 56902 )
Business Address: 215 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
(905) 764-5040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 215
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 764-5040
Fax: (905) 764-2977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Benzaquen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Benzaquen (CPSO#: 56902 )
Business Address: 215 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
(905) 764-5040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN BENZAQUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENZAQUEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN BENZAQUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENZAQUEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986