THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-535 Park St
Kitchener ON N2G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-578-1294
Fax: 519-578-1362

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rangaswamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangaswamy (CPSO#: 56911 )
Business Address: Urology Associates
18 - 450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9
(519) 578-1282

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-535 Park St
Kitchener ON N2G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-578-1294
Fax: 519-578-1362

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rangaswamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangaswamy (CPSO#: 56911 )
Business Address: Urology Associates
18 - 450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9
(519) 578-1282

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATISH RANGASWAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGASWAMY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATISH RANGASWAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGASWAMY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986