THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 173 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 1G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-488-4664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ann Marie Priestner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Priestner (CPSO#: 56958 )
Business Address: 29 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 1E8
9056812863
Business Address: 173 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 1G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 173 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 1G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-488-4664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ann Marie Priestner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Priestner (CPSO#: 56958 )
Business Address: 29 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 1E8
9056812863
Business Address: 173 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 1G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANN MARIE PRIESTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIESTNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANN MARIE PRIESTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIESTNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986