THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:32:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road , Suite 101
Guelph, ON
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197661360
Fax: 5197634315
Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
Suite 101, 83 Dawson Rd
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Phone: 519-766-1360
Fax: 519-763-4315

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Reid Rafla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Reid Rafla (CPSO#: 56961 )
Business Address: 83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road , Suite 101
Guelph, ON
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197661360
Fax: 5197634315
Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
Suite 101, 83 Dawson Rd
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Phone: 519-766-1360
Fax: 519-763-4315

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Reid Rafla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Reid Rafla (CPSO#: 56961 )
Business Address: 83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER JEANETTE REID RAFLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID RAFLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER JEANETTE REID RAFLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID RAFLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986