THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-25 Industrial St
Suite 208B
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-441-2245
Fax: 416-441-2246
Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6384
Fax: 416-469-6424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Engineering, Professional Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Engineering, Professional
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Weiler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Weiler (CPSO#: 56977 )
Business Address: 208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
416-441-2245

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-25 Industrial St
Suite 208B
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-441-2245
Fax: 416-441-2246
Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6384
Fax: 416-469-6424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Engineering, Professional Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Engineering, Professional
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Weiler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Weiler (CPSO#: 56977 )
Business Address: 208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
416-441-2245

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH WEILER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEILER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH WEILER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEILER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986