THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 11:12:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1935 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-3322
Fax: (705) 523-4343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher McKibbon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McKibbon (CPSO#: 56980 )
Business Address: 1935 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3C6
(705) 523-3322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1935 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-3322
Fax: (705) 523-4343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher McKibbon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McKibbon (CPSO#: 56980 )
Business Address: 1935 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3C6
(705) 523-3322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DONALD MCKIBBON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKIBBON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DONALD MCKIBBON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKIBBON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986