THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 508
95 Bayly Street
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 427-6111
Fax: (905) 427-4482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Ricer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ricer (CPSO#: 57005 )
Business Address: 508 - 95 Bayly Street
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(905) 427-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 508
95 Bayly Street
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 427-6111
Fax: (905) 427-4482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Ricer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ricer (CPSO#: 57005 )
Business Address: 508 - 95 Bayly Street
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(905) 427-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILFRED RICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILFRED RICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1986