THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Pathology and Lab Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8479
Fax: (519) 685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hull / Chin-Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chin-Yee (CPSO#: 57027 ) Dr. M. Hull (CPSO#: 57318 )
Business Address: 499 Baker Street
London Ontario N6C 1Y1
(519) 433-0505
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-218a
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8479

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Pathology and Lab Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8479
Fax: (519) 685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hull / Chin-Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chin-Yee (CPSO#: 57027 ) Dr. M. Hull (CPSO#: 57318 )
Business Address: 499 Baker Street
London Ontario N6C 1Y1
(519) 433-0505
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-218a
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8479

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN HAROLD CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN HAROLD CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986