THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 07:18:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
100 Queensway Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 561-9660
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M2N1
Phone: 416-561-9660
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C1A5
Phone: 416-561-9660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bill Ike Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong (CPSO#: 57029 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
100 Queensway Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 561-9660
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M2N1
Phone: 416-561-9660
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C1A5
Phone: 416-561-9660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bill Ike Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong (CPSO#: 57029 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILL IKE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILL IKE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986