THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:31:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 879 Shefford Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 741-6904
Fax: (613) 741-0021

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 13 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter W. Harding Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Harding (CPSO#: 57067 )
Business Address: 200-879 Shefford Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 8H9
(613) 741-6904

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 879 Shefford Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 741-6904
Fax: (613) 741-0021

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 13 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter W. Harding Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Harding (CPSO#: 57067 )
Business Address: 200-879 Shefford Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 8H9
(613) 741-6904

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM HARDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM HARDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986