THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond Street
Western University, Health Services
University Community Centre, Room11
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Fax: 519 661 3380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen G. Tallon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tallon (CPSO#: 57113 )
Business Address: 1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond Street
Western University, Health Services
University Community Centre, Room11
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Fax: 519 661 3380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen G. Tallon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tallon (CPSO#: 57113 )
Business Address: 1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GERAGHTY TALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GERAGHTY TALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986