THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 169 Talbot St S
Essex ON N8M 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-961-9436
Fax: 844-951-5073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Albus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Albus (CPSO#: 57125 )
Business Address: Essex Evening Walk-In Clinic
169 Talbot Street South
Essex Ontario N8M 1B7
(519) 961-9436

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 169 Talbot St S
Essex ON N8M 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-961-9436
Fax: 844-951-5073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Albus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Albus (CPSO#: 57125 )
Business Address: Essex Evening Walk-In Clinic
169 Talbot Street South
Essex Ontario N8M 1B7
(519) 961-9436

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE WILLIAM ALBUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE WILLIAM ALBUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 May 2017
Summary:
Effective August 2, 2019, Dr. Albus has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 May 2017
Summary:
Effective August 2, 2019, Dr. Albus has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986