THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:09:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 354 Saint James Street
London Ontario N6A 1X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672-3462
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. W. Fuss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fuss (CPSO#: 57145 )
Business Address: E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: 73415 Sandy Beach Road
Zurich Ontario N0M 2T0
5194761833

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 354 Saint James Street
London Ontario N6A 1X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672-3462
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. W. Fuss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fuss (CPSO#: 57145 )
Business Address: E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: 73415 Sandy Beach Road
Zurich Ontario N0M 2T0
5194761833

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM FUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM FUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986