THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:48:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie Street
Suite 318 A
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-5180
Fax: (519) 245-3391

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gomes (CPSO#: 57146 )
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
318A
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2A5
519 245 5180

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie Street
Suite 318 A
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-5180
Fax: (519) 245-3391

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gomes (CPSO#: 57146 )
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
318A
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2A5
519 245 5180

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID REINALDO DA SILVA GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID REINALDO DA SILVA GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986