THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L3J 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Address: 385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
Phone: 519 748 2542
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. Ireland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ireland (CPSO#: 57149 )
Business Address: 4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B5
(905) 563-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L3J 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Address: 385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
Phone: 519 748 2542
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. Ireland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ireland (CPSO#: 57149 )
Business Address: 4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B5
(905) 563-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD MCGHIE IRELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRELAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD MCGHIE IRELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRELAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986