THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond Street
University of Western Ontario
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-4156
Fax: (519) 850-2497

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Litchfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Litchfield (CPSO#: 57162 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond Street
University of Western Ontario
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-4156
Fax: (519) 850-2497

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Litchfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Litchfield (CPSO#: 57162 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BRUCE LITCHFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITCHFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BRUCE LITCHFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITCHFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986