THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Leonard Avenue
Altum Health
Toronto Ontario M5T 2R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5185
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 110-2 Robert Speck Parkway
Altum Health
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1H8
Phone: 905-897-7007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 13 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.P. Von Schroeder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Von Schroeder (CPSO#: 57175 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
2 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5641
Business Address: 191 Ellis Ave
Toronto ON M6S 2X4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Leonard Avenue
Altum Health
Toronto Ontario M5T 2R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5185
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 110-2 Robert Speck Parkway
Altum Health
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1H8
Phone: 905-897-7007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 13 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.P. Von Schroeder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Von Schroeder (CPSO#: 57175 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
2 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5641
Business Address: 191 Ellis Ave
Toronto ON M6S 2X4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT PETER VON SCHROEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON SCHROEDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT PETER VON SCHROEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON SCHROEDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986