THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:00:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7454
Fax: (416) 281-7453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.G. Stringer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stringer (CPSO#: 57205 )
Business Address: Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 281-7454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7454
Fax: (416) 281-7453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.G. Stringer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stringer (CPSO#: 57205 )
Business Address: Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 281-7454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GLENN STRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GLENN STRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986