THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:00:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 434-1694
Fax: (905) 434-6308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yassein (CPSO#: 57208 )
Business Address: 201 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J5
905-434-1694

Corporation Name: Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 434-1694
Fax: (905) 434-6308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yassein (CPSO#: 57208 )
Business Address: 201 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J5
905-434-1694

Corporation Name: Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOSSAM YASSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOSSAM YASSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986