THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 19 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Anglin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Anglin (CPSO#: 57238 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 19 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Anglin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Anglin (CPSO#: 57238 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JAMES ANGLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JAMES ANGLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986