THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:42:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central Community Health Centre
359 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 633-7989
Fax: (519) 633-8467

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Nov 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care St Thomas Mental Health Site
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David W. K. Lum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lum (CPSO#: 57254 )
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2030
Business Address: Central Community Health Centre
359 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central Community Health Centre
359 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 633-7989
Fax: (519) 633-8467

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Nov 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care St Thomas Mental Health Site
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David W. K. Lum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lum (CPSO#: 57254 )
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2030
Business Address: Central Community Health Centre
359 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WAI KEUNG LUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WAI KEUNG LUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1986
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 1986