THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:41:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Meridian Avenue
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 672-3371
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Hutten-Czapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hutten-Czapski (CPSO#: 57283 )
Business Address: 95 Meridian Avenue
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
(705) 672-3371

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Meridian Avenue
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 672-3371
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Hutten-Czapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hutten-Czapski (CPSO#: 57283 )
Business Address: 95 Meridian Avenue
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
(705) 672-3371

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ANDREW HUTTEN-CZAPSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTEN-CZAPSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ANDREW HUTTEN-CZAPSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTEN-CZAPSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986