THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liege, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alfred Sisto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sisto (CPSO#: 57295 )
Business Address: 37 Thorncliffe Place
Nepean Ontario K2H 6L5
(613) 596-1568

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Liege, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alfred Sisto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sisto (CPSO#: 57295 )
Business Address: 37 Thorncliffe Place
Nepean Ontario K2H 6L5
(613) 596-1568

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFRED SISTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFRED SISTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liege, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986