THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 King Street East
Suite 3100
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054197007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cleminson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cleminson (CPSO#: 57298 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Suite W C A 360
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-9556

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 King Street East
Suite 3100
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054197007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cleminson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cleminson (CPSO#: 57298 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Suite W C A 360
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-9556

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS MICHAEL CLEMINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS MICHAEL CLEMINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 26 Oct 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1993

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986