THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health Centre
Hematology/Medical Oncology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-6542
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kuruvilla (CPSO#: 57307 )
Business Address: 200 - 1A Conestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 703-8320
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6542
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health Centre
Hematology/Medical Oncology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-6542
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kuruvilla (CPSO#: 57307 )
Business Address: 200 - 1A Conestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 703-8320
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6542
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986