THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sirota, Marcie (Used Until: 03 Aug 2009)
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Glen Rush Boulevard LL
North York Ontario M5N 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-5452
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcia Sirota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sirota (CPSO#: 57315 )
Business Address: 89 Glen Rush Boulevard
Lower Level
North York Ontario M5N 2V2
(416) 782-5452

General Information

Former Name: Sirota, Marcie (Used Until: 03 Aug 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Glen Rush Boulevard LL
North York Ontario M5N 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-5452
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcia Sirota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sirota (CPSO#: 57315 )
Business Address: 89 Glen Rush Boulevard
Lower Level
North York Ontario M5N 2V2
(416) 782-5452

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIA SIROTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIROTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIA SIROTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIROTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986