THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:38:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway - Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-4708
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katalin Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kovacs (CPSO#: 57321 )
Business Address: Queensway - Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway - Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-4708
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katalin Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kovacs (CPSO#: 57321 )
Business Address: Queensway - Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATALIN KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATALIN KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986