THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:07:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9292 Highway 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 527-7959
Fax: (705) 527-1773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Veall (CPSO#: 57334 )
Business Address: 9292 Highway 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9292 Highway 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 527-7959
Fax: (705) 527-1773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Veall (CPSO#: 57334 )
Business Address: 9292 Highway 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN BRIAN VEALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN BRIAN VEALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986