THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 966-3886
Fax: (416) 487-8746

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl S. Kucey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kucey (CPSO#: 57393 )
Business Address: Suite 402
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
(416) 966-3886

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 966-3886
Fax: (416) 487-8746

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl S. Kucey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kucey (CPSO#: 57393 )
Business Address: Suite 402
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
(416) 966-3886

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYL STANTON KUCEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYL STANTON KUCEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986