THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Sunnybrook Odette
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5248
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Spaner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Spaner (CPSO#: 57405 )
Business Address: 4164806100 Extn: 2510

Corporation Name: Dr. David Spaner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Sunnybrook Odette
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5248
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Spaner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Spaner (CPSO#: 57405 )
Business Address: 4164806100 Extn: 2510

Corporation Name: Dr. David Spaner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ELLIOT SPANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPANER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ELLIOT SPANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPANER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986