THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Room 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7454
Fax: (416) 586-4747

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Croitoru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Croitoru (CPSO#: 57420 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Room 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Room 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7454
Fax: (416) 586-4747

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Croitoru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Croitoru (CPSO#: 57420 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Room 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH CROITORU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROITORU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH CROITORU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROITORU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1986