THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 402
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Ing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ing (CPSO#: 57428 )
Business Address: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
(905) 852-9771
Business Address: 381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Health Centre
402 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7122

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 402
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Ing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ing (CPSO#: 57428 )
Business Address: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
(905) 852-9771
Business Address: 381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Health Centre
402 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7122

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986