THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:54:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 622-0067
Fax: (519) 622-6146

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saul Vizel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vizel (CPSO#: 57439 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 622-0067
Fax: (519) 622-6146

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saul Vizel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vizel (CPSO#: 57439 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAUL VIZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIZEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAUL VIZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIZEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986