THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 450 Whites Road
suite 400
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 866 947 8539
Fax: 519 417 3831
Address: 44399 Glenannon Rd
RR1
Clifford Ontario N0G 2X0
Phone: (519) 292-6676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Cressey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cressey (CPSO#: 57480 )
Business Address: 420 Main Street East
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Business Address: 44399 Glenannon Road
RR1
Clifford Ontario N0G 1M0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 450 Whites Road
suite 400
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 866 947 8539
Fax: 519 417 3831
Address: 44399 Glenannon Rd
RR1
Clifford Ontario N0G 2X0
Phone: (519) 292-6676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Cressey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cressey (CPSO#: 57480 )
Business Address: 420 Main Street East
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Business Address: 44399 Glenannon Road
RR1
Clifford Ontario N0G 1M0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FREDERICK CRESSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRESSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FREDERICK CRESSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRESSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1986