THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:15:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 712 Davis Drive
Suite 306
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6721
Fax: (905) 836-6016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aziza A. Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajan (CPSO#: 57515 )
Business Address: 306 - 712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 836-6721

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 712 Davis Drive
Suite 306
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6721
Fax: (905) 836-6016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aziza A. Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajan (CPSO#: 57515 )
Business Address: 306 - 712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 836-6721

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZIZA AMINMOHAMED RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZIZA AMINMOHAMED RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986