THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:09:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-747
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hosptial
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Radiology Consultants
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-8800
Fax: (416) 494-9257

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B Ginzburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ginzburg (CPSO#: 57536 )
Business Address: York Radiology Consultants
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6186
Business Address: 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 756-6186

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-747
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hosptial
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Radiology Consultants
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-8800
Fax: (416) 494-9257

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B Ginzburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ginzburg (CPSO#: 57536 )
Business Address: York Radiology Consultants
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6186
Business Address: 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 756-6186

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1986