THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:56:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Vine Street
Suite 103
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 687-8322
Fax: (905) 687-8766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Beiko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Beiko (CPSO#: 57630 )
Business Address: Suite 103
180 Vine Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(905) 687-8322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Vine Street
Suite 103
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 687-8322
Fax: (905) 687-8766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Beiko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Beiko (CPSO#: 57630 )
Business Address: Suite 103
180 Vine Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(905) 687-8322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE HUTUL HACHKOWSKI BEIKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEIKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE HUTUL HACHKOWSKI BEIKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEIKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1986