THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21800
Fax: (416) 242-1058

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Krajewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krajewski (CPSO#: 57651 )
Business Address: Humber River General Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 21800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21800
Fax: (416) 242-1058

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Krajewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krajewski (CPSO#: 57651 )
Business Address: Humber River General Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 21800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM KRAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM KRAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986