THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:54:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jammu University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 502 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-6000
Fax: (519) 433-5404
Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5649;
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins, ON
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: (705) 264-6524

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sidhu McDowall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sidhu (CPSO#: 57687 ) Dr. M. McDowall (CPSO#: 60739 )
Business Address: 502 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
(519) 645-6000
Business Address: 506 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
(519) 672-5878

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Jammu University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 502 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-6000
Fax: (519) 433-5404
Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5649;
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins, ON
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: (705) 264-6524

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sidhu McDowall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sidhu (CPSO#: 57687 ) Dr. M. McDowall (CPSO#: 60739 )
Business Address: 502 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
(519) 645-6000
Business Address: 506 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
(519) 672-5878

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jammu University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1990

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1986