THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 34403
Fax: (905) 721-4780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Sagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sagi (CPSO#: 57908 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 34403
Fax: (905) 721-4780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Sagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sagi (CPSO#: 57908 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIYHOO SAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIYHOO SAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 1987