THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:30:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8326
Fax: (519) 685-8470

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G. Blake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Blake (CPSO#: 57949 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8326
Fax: (519) 685-8470

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G. Blake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Blake (CPSO#: 57949 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GERARD BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GERARD BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1987