THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:48:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gujarat University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 108
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 678-7324
Fax: (905) 678-7145

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pandhi (CPSO#: 57959 )
Business Address: 108 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 678-7324

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Gujarat University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 108
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 678-7324
Fax: (905) 678-7145

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pandhi (CPSO#: 57959 )
Business Address: 108 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 678-7324

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
02 Apr 2001
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 02 2001
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 2, 2001, Dr. Hemant M. Pandhi is limited to general practice
pending an assessment agreeable to the Registrar confirming that Dr. Pandhi
displays the knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to
practise emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment..

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 2, 2001, Dr. Hemant M. Pandhi is limited to general practice
pending an assessment agreeable to the Registrar confirming that Dr. Pandhi
displays the knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to
practise emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment..

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 02 Apr 2001
Summary of Decision:
On April 2, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pandhi s guilty plea and found him guilty of:

(1) engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he;

(i) failed to advise the College that there were disciplinary actions pending against him by the licensing authority in the State of New York;

(ii) advised the College that he had not entered into an agreement with a licensing authority in the face of potential disciplinary action by the authority, when this was not a true or accurate statement.

(2) in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found Dr. Pandhi committed an act of professional misconduct;

(3) in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has made a finding of professional misconduct or a similar finding against Dr. Pandhi.

The Committee directed the following penalty:

(1) recorded reprimand;

(2) that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of three months, commencing January 10, 2001 until April 10, 2001;

(3) the Registrar is directed to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.Pandhi s certificate of registration:

(a) that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be limited to general practice pending an assessment agreeable to the Registrar confirming that Dr. Pandhi displays the knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to practice emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment.

(4) that Dr. Pandhi pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000, to be paid no later than June 30, 2001;

(5) the Registrar is directed to register the result of any successful appeal by Dr. Pandhi of the Determination and Order of the State Board for Professional Medical Conduct in the State of New York in the matter of Hemant Pandhi, M.D. made September 22, 2000.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 02, 2001

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 02 Apr 2001
Summary of Decision:
On April 2, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pandhi s guilty plea and found him guilty of:

(1) engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he;

(i) failed to advise the College that there were disciplinary actions pending against him by the licensing authority in the State of New York;

(ii) advised the College that he had not entered into an agreement with a licensing authority in the face of potential disciplinary action by the authority, when this was not a true or accurate statement.

(2) in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found Dr. Pandhi committed an act of professional misconduct;

(3) in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has made a finding of professional misconduct or a similar finding against Dr. Pandhi.

The Committee directed the following penalty:

(1) recorded reprimand;

(2) that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of three months, commencing January 10, 2001 until April 10, 2001;

(3) the Registrar is directed to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.Pandhi s certificate of registration:

(a) that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be limited to general practice pending an assessment agreeable to the Registrar confirming that Dr. Pandhi displays the knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to practice emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment.

(4) that Dr. Pandhi pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000, to be paid no later than June 30, 2001;

(5) the Registrar is directed to register the result of any successful appeal by Dr. Pandhi of the Determination and Order of the State Board for Professional Medical Conduct in the State of New York in the matter of Hemant Pandhi, M.D. made September 22, 2000.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 02, 2001

Training

Medical School: Gujarat University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 10 Apr 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1987
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2001

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2001

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 1987