THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:44:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8600
Extension: 58640
Fax: (519) 685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 02 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vincent (CPSO#: 57969 )
Business Address: P.O. Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8634

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8600
Extension: 58640
Fax: (519) 685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 02 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vincent (CPSO#: 57969 )
Business Address: P.O. Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8634

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 1987
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 1987