THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
180 Vine Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-2761
Fax: (905) 688-6638

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 29 Aug 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dianne M. Heritz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heritz (CPSO#: 57979 )
Business Address: Suite 202
180 Vine Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(905) 688-2761

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
180 Vine Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-2761
Fax: (905) 688-6638

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 29 Aug 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dianne M. Heritz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heritz (CPSO#: 57979 )
Business Address: Suite 202
180 Vine Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(905) 688-2761

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANNE MARGARET HERITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANNE MARGARET HERITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987