THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:49:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga, Ontario
Mississauga Ontario L5G3H5
Phone: 905-278-7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Cumberland Clinic
162 Cumberland St, Suite #225
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M3R 3N5
Phone: (416) 925-0113
Fax: (416) 323-1344
Address: Dr. Sean Rice
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Suite 345
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 391-4048
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centric Health Surgical Centre
20 Wynford Drive , Suite 103
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
Phone: 416-441-2111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 17 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles David Knapp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Knapp (CPSO#: 58011 )
Business Address: Psutka Dental
4288 Village Centre Ct
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1S2
(905) 275-0058
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6002
Business Address: Rice Clinic
Suite 345
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 391-4048
Business Address: Treehouse Dental
115 Humber College B
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
(647) 490-6042
Business Address: The Cumberland Clinic
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto Ontario M3R 3N5
(416) 925-0113
Business Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: Centric Health
103-20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 441-2111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga, Ontario
Mississauga Ontario L5G3H5
Phone: 905-278-7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Cumberland Clinic
162 Cumberland St, Suite #225
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M3R 3N5
Phone: (416) 925-0113
Fax: (416) 323-1344
Address: Dr. Sean Rice
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Suite 345
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 391-4048
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centric Health Surgical Centre
20 Wynford Drive , Suite 103
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
Phone: 416-441-2111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 17 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles David Knapp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Knapp (CPSO#: 58011 )
Business Address: Psutka Dental
4288 Village Centre Ct
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1S2
(905) 275-0058
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6002
Business Address: Rice Clinic
Suite 345
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 391-4048
Business Address: Treehouse Dental
115 Humber College B
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
(647) 490-6042
Business Address: The Cumberland Clinic
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto Ontario M3R 3N5
(416) 925-0113
Business Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: Centric Health
103-20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 441-2111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES DAVID KNAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNAPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES DAVID KNAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNAPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987