THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:29:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Cynthia Cres
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 2R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 830-0016
Fax: (905) 830-1852

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eleonor Kopylenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kopylenko (CPSO#: 58051 )
Business Address: 9 Cynthia Cres
Richmond Hill ON L4E 2R6
905-830-0016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Cynthia Cres
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 2R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 830-0016
Fax: (905) 830-1852

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eleonor Kopylenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kopylenko (CPSO#: 58051 )
Business Address: 9 Cynthia Cres
Richmond Hill ON L4E 2R6
905-830-0016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEONORA KOPYLENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPYLENKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEONORA KOPYLENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPYLENKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987