THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:27:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division Of Gastroenterology
16-052 Cardinal Carter Wing
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5848
Fax: (416) 864-5994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 17 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Young-In Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kim (CPSO#: 58053 )
Business Address: St. Michaels Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
16-038 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5848

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division Of Gastroenterology
16-052 Cardinal Carter Wing
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5848
Fax: (416) 864-5994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 17 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Young-In Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kim (CPSO#: 58053 )
Business Address: St. Michaels Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
16-038 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5848

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUNG-IN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUNG-IN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987